U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ritter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 26, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 20, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 18, 2016: [Furlough]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2016: [Request]
  • March 24, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • March 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 24, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.