U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knigge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 02, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.