U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Connors
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 26, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 16, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Request]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.