U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuehl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Request]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2016: [Statement of Probable Cause]
  • March 25, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.