U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-10009-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Drippon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 27, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 28, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.