U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:99-cr-40137-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Totaro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 06, 2022: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Disqualify]
  • August 05, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response]
  • May 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2022: [Supplement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Request]
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 14, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Disqualify]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Submit Supplemental Briefing]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Supplement]
  • September 03, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 18, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 23, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Remark]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 02, 2019: [Release from Custody]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Request to Disburse Unclaimed Funds]
  • January 02, 2018: [Request to Disburse Unclaimed Funds (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.