U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 09, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Request]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 31, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.