U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 03, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2016: [Statement of Probable Cause]
  • April 04, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.