U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04046
  • Case Name: Bell v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • July 15, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Sanctions]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Enforce]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Letter Received]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 21, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Received]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2020: [Letter Received]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter Received]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • October 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 10, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 10, 2019: [Response]
  • October 01, 2019: [Enforce]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Letter Received]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment - Consent]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 23, 2018: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Request]
  • March 22, 2018: [Response]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Response]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 19, 2018: [Leave to]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 12, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 11, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 11, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Leave to]
  • March 07, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 03, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 03, 2017: [Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2017: [Letter Received]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response]
  • December 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 22, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 26, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 24, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 13, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2016: [Letter Received]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 14, 2016: [Response]
  • July 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • May 17, 2016: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • April 05, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 05, 2016: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.