U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 06, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Request]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.