U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pounds et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 21, 2022: [Furlough]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 24, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • October 11, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Response]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2016: [Request]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.