U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sitzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 12, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Request]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 11, 2016: [Request]
  • July 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.