U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 04, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Response]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.