U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canahui-Ardeano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Waiver]
  • April 06, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.