U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2017: [Forfeiture]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 08, 2016: [Forfeiture]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.