U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torevell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.