U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cournoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 24, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Sealed Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Certificate]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 26, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 09, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.