U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. New
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 24, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 15, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.