U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 24, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.