U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrera-Navarro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 13, 2016: [Request]
  • April 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.