U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bluedog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 05, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • March 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.