U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30045-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Espino et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 24, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 12, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 29, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 13, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 12, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • May 26, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • May 26, 2016: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • May 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Request]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 13, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.