U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas-Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 15, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 06, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Certificate]
  • October 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2018: [For Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 11, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 25, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 08, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • February 02, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 02, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 20, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 18, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 13, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 12, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 12, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 05, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 04, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 28, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • December 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 23, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 23, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • September 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Response]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 07, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Request]
  • April 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2016: [Request]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2016: [Request]
  • April 25, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.