U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keys
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • May 14, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 13, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 20, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 20, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 01, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 24, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 08, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Verdict]
  • December 07, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • December 07, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • December 07, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 07, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • December 06, 2017: [Count(s) Renumbered]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury List]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 05, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Response]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 17, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 14, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Request]
  • June 13, 2017: [Request]
  • June 13, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 26, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2016: [Request]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2016: [Request]
  • May 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 09, 2016: [Arrest]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.