U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rezac
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • June 01, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Joinder]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 12, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 23, 2017: [Response]
  • March 22, 2017: [For Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Suppress]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 26, 2016: [Request]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Request]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.