U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 02, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2016: [Request]
  • April 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.