U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone Arrow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Request]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.