U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oakie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 27, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 08, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • May 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • May 08, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 05, 2017: [Verdict]
  • May 05, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 03, 2017: [Jury List]
  • May 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2017: [Witness List]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • April 24, 2017: [Jury List]
  • April 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 24, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 21, 2017: [For Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [In Limine]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 07, 2016: [Request]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 03, 2016: [Furlough]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 18, 2016: [Request]
  • May 17, 2016: [Return of Service]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Request]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 29, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.