U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hollow Horn et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 06, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 03, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • March 02, 2017: [Jury List]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 22, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • February 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Furlough]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 22, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Request]
  • April 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Request]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.