U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Bird et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 16, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 29, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 05, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Response]
  • December 09, 2016: [Joinder]
  • December 08, 2016: [In Limine]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 09, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 02, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 02, 2016: [Exhibit List]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Witness List]
  • August 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response]
  • July 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Suppress]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Request]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Request]
  • April 21, 2016: [Request]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.