U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luxon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 04, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2016: [Request]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.