U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keeble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • February 02, 2022: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 20, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response]
  • January 18, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 06, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • January 06, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2021: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 23, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Response]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Suppress]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Request]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2016: [Request]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.