U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.