U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fleury
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 24, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 23, 2018: [Furlough]
  • April 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Variance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extend]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2016: [Request]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2016: [Request]
  • May 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 06, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.