U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 22, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 14, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Revoke]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Request]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • April 20, 2016: [Request]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.