U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Uses The Knife
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 01, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Request]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.