U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • August 04, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 04, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Verdict]
  • August 04, 2016: [Response to Jury Question]
  • August 04, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • August 04, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 04, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 04, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 03, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 03, 2016: [Jury List]
  • August 03, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 01, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2016: [Witness List]
  • July 25, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2016: [Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Compel ]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Request]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.