U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cordier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 17, 2016: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 07, 2016: [Exhibit List]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response]
  • August 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Suppress]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2016: [Request]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 10, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2016: [Request]
  • June 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.