U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poitra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • April 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 17, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 12, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2017: [Revoke]
  • January 17, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • January 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2016: [Request]
  • May 10, 2016: [Request]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.