U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrisette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 20, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Release from Custody]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 22, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 15, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 30, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 11, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.