U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 30, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • August 30, 2016: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • August 30, 2016: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Request]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2016: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • April 14, 2016: [Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.