U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 20, 2016: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • September 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Request]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.