U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Barse et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 12, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • November 02, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 02, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 26, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 10, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 05, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2017: [Response]
  • May 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 25, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 25, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 07, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 06, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2016: [Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2016: [Request]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.