U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cummings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 14, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2016: [Forfeiture]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 02, 2016: [Request]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.