U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2018: [For Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 12, 2018: [Furlough]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 08, 2018: [Furlough]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Request for Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.