U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.