U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-10042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Looking Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 02, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 12, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 09, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.