U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godiava
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 07, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 02, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Request]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.