U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 03, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 08, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • September 08, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 07, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.