U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Koscak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 17, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [For Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 10, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Request]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.